Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6431
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6431
Title:Jose Armando Bazan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40724)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019.
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Davis v. United States, 589 U. S. ___ (2020) (per curiam).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Scott Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of J. Scott Sullivan
22211 I.H. 10 West
Suite 1206
San Antonio, TX 78257

ssullivan18@satx.rr.com
2107222807
Party name: Jose Bazan
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543