SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-641
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-641
Vide 19-719
Title:
Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation, Petitioner
v.
Dami Hospitality, LLC
Docketed:
November 18, 2019
Linked with 19A207
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Colorado
Case Numbers:
(17SC200)
Decision Date:
June 17, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2019
Application (19A207) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Aug 27 2019
Application (19A207) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 14, 2019.
Nov 14 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 06 2019
Brief of respondent Dami Hospitality, LLC in support filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 23 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019
Reply of petitioner Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Reuel Olson
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203
eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory George Garre
Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004
gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Dami Hospitality, LLC
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##