Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-631
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-631
Title:William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2019
Linked with 19A271
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1588)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2019Application (19A271) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 19, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2019Application (19A271) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 21, 2019.
Oct 11 2019Application (19A271) to extend further the time from October 21, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Application (19A271) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 18, 2019.
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Brief of respondents American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al. in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 18 2019Reply of petitioners William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 10 2020Petition GRANTED.
Feb 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 22, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Brief of petitioners William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Feb 26 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Student Loan Servicing Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and National Retail Federation filed supporting neither party.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Fifteen Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 25 2020Brief of respondents American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Energy Supply Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Healthcare Companies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Midland Credit Management, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 03 2020Amicus brief of Association of Credit & Collection Professionals (ACA) not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2020)
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, May 6, 2020.
Apr 24 2020Reply of petitioners William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 06 2020Argued. For petitioners: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C.
May 06 2020Motion of ACA International, Inc. for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (May 20, 2020 - to be resubmitted in proper format.)
May 20 2020Motion of ACA International, Inc. for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (May 26, 2020) (Dupilicate submission).
May 20 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by ACA International, Inc. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by ACA International, Inc. DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al.
Other
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Ave NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Cato Institute
Michael Patrick Daly
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
One Logan Square, Suite 2000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

michael.daly@faegredrinker.com
215-988-2604
Party name: Retail Energy Supply Association
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue N.W., Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

pdouglas@ifs.org
(202) 301-9800
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Michael Dietz Roth
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
725 S Figueroa St, 31st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

mroth@bsfllp.com
(213) 6299040
Party name: Healthcare Companies
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Paul Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

psherman@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(312) 759-5947
Party name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Steven Gregory White
    Counsel of Record
Gray Reed & McGraw
1601 Elm Street
Suite 4600
Dalla, TX 75201

gwhite@grayreed.com
254-717-5728
Party name: Association of Credit & Collection Professionals (ACA)
John Michael Baker
    Counsel of Record
Greene Espel, PLLP
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jbaker@greeneespel.com
6123738344
Party name: National League of Cities, National Association of Counties, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Student Loan Servicing Alliance
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Keith James Keogh
    Counsel of Record
Keogh Law, LTD
55 W. Monroe St, Suite 3390
Chicago, IL 60603

keith@keoghlaw.com
312-726-1092
Party name: Fifteen Members of Congress
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and National Retail Federation
Marc RotenbergElectronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1519 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Law Center
7 Winthrop Square
Boston, MA 02110

tara.twomey@comcast.net
617-542-8010
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, Verizon, Consumer Federation of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543