Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6186
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6186
Title:Latroy Leon Burris, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 7, 2019
Linked with 19A190
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10478)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 15 2019Application (19A190) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 2, 2019 to November 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A190) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 3, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 6, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Memorandum of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 28 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Latroy Leon Burris filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79109

matthew_wright@fd.org
8063242370
Party name: Latroy Leon Burris
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543