Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6156 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6156 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Randy Ethan Halprin, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:October 3, 2019
Linked with 19A377
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-70016, 19-70017)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOtherAppendixProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Application (19A377) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2019.
Nov 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 3, 2020.
Jan 03 2020Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Institutions Division in opposition to petition for a writ of certiorari and application (19A377) for a stay of execution filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Reply of petitioner Randy Halprin filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tivon Schardl
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender, Capital Habeas Unit, Western District of Texas
919 Congress, Suite 950
Austin, TX 78701

Tivon_Schardl@fd.org
7372073008
Party name: Randy Halprin
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Wren Morris
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701

jennifer.morris@oag.texas.gov
5129362991
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Institutions Division

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543