Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-607
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-607
Title:Woodcrest Homes, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Carousel Farms Metropolitan District
Docketed:November 12, 2019
Linked with 19A175
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(18SC30)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 12 2019Application (19A175) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 8, 2019 to November 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Aug 16 2019Application (19A175) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 7, 2019.
Aug 21 2019Blanket Consent of Woodcrest Homes, Inc. not accepted for filing. (September 05, 2019)
Nov 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Woodcrest Homes, Inc. not accepted for filing. (November 13, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Nov 13 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Woodcrest Homes, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 12, 2019 to February 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2020.
Dec 10 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief of respondent Carousel Farms Metropolitan District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Woodcrest Homes, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: Carousel Farms Metropolitan District
Other
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Owners' Counsel of America, NFIB Small Business Legal Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543