Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-606
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-606
Title:Ukraine, Petitioner
v.
Pao Tatneft
Docketed:November 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-7057)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Brief of respondent Pao Tatneft in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 11 2019Reply of petitioner Ukraine filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maria Kostytska
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
1700 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkostytska@winston.com
202-282-5841
Party name: Ukraine
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan I. Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary, Gottlieb et. al.
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-0000

jblackman@cgsh.com
212-225-2490
Party name: Pao Tatneft

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543