Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-601
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-601
Title:Collabo Innovations, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Sony Corporation, et al.
Docketed:November 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1311)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2019 to January 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2020, for all respondents.
Dec 17 2019Motion of respondent Sony Corporation to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2020 to February 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2020, for all respondents.
Feb 07 2020Brief of respondent Sony Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2020Brief of federal respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Reply of petitioner Collabo Innovations Inc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 12 2020Rescheduled.
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 02 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick J. Conroy
    Counsel of Record
Bragalone Conroy PC
2200 Ross Avenue
Suite 4500W
Dallas, TX 75201

pconroy@bcpc-law.com
2147856670
Party name: Collabo Innovations Inc
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew S. Baluch
    Counsel of Record
Smith Baluch LLP
700 Pennsylvania Ave SE
Suite 2060
Washington, DC 20003

baluch@smithbaluch.com
2028802397
Party name: Sony Corporation
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543