Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5988 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5988 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tyrone Chalmers, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:September 18, 2019
Linked with 19A182
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2018-01650-CCA-R28-PD)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 17, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2019Application (19A182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2019 to October 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentOtherOther
Aug 18 2019Application (19A182) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 16, 2019.
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 18, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Oct 18 2019Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Nov 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelley Jane Henry
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

kelley_henry@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Tyrone Chalmers
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Anthony Ball
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

ben.ball@ag.tn.gov
615-741-7859
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543