Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-598
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-598
Title:Joy Spurr, Petitioner
v.
Melissa L. Pope, Chief Judge, Tribal Court of the Nottawaseppi Huron Band of Potawatomi, et al.
Docketed:November 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2174)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondents Melissa L. Pope, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Josiah Spurr
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1114 Beaconsfield Avenue
Grosse Pointe Park, MI 48230

aa9966@wayne.edu
3133312902
Party name: Joy Spurr
Attorneys for Respondents
David Angelo Giampetroni
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Katzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street, Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

dgiampetroni@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Melissa L. Pope, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543