Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-597
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-597
Title:Morris Reese, Petitioner
v.
Sprint Nextel Corporation, et al.
Docketed:November 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1971, 2018-1972, 2018-1973, 2018-1974, 2018-1975)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Waiver of right of respondents AT & T Mobility II, LLC and TracFone Wireless, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Sprint Nextel Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent T - Mobile USA, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 19 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Morris Reese filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2020)
Feb 07 2020Brief of respondent AT&T Mobility II in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2020Reply of petitioner Morris Reese filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Dhuey
    Counsel of Record
456 Boynton Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707

ajdhuey@comcast.net
(510) 528-8200
Party name: Morris Reese
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Hawes
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, LLP
910 Louisiana St.
Houston, TX 77002-4995

michael.hawes@bakerbotts.com
7132291750
Party name: AT&T Mobility II
Jay Edward Heidrick
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli PC
900 W. 48th Place, Suite 900
Kansas City, MO 64112

jheidrick@polsinelli.com
816-572-4765
Party name: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Sharon Audrey Israel
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
600 Travis Street, Suite 3400
Houston, TX 77002-9508

sisrael@shb.com
7135465689
Party name: TracFone Wireless, Inc.
Vincent John GalluzzoCrowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

vagalluzzo@crowell.com
202-624-2781
Party name: AT & T Mobility II, LLC and TracFone Wireless, Inc.
Greer Novalis ShawHagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP
301 N. Lake Ave., Suite 920
Pasadena, CA 91101

213-330-7145
Party name: T - Mobile USA, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543