Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-591
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-591
Title:Chestnut Hill Sound Inc., Petitioner
v.
Apple Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1163)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2019Waiver of right of respondent Apple Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent Andrei Iancu to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexis Faye Mosser
    Counsel of Record
Glast, Phillips & Murray, P.C.
14801 Quorum Drive, Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75254

amosser@gpm-law.com
(972) 419-7124
Party name: Chestnut Hill Sound Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Andrew Dragseth
    Counsel of Record
Fish and Richardson P.C.
60 South Sixth Street
Suite 3300
Minneapolis, MN 55402

dragseth@fr.com
6123372550
Party name: Apple Inc.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543