Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5908
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5908
Title:Howard Leon Combs, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11402)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 11, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2019 to November 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Memorandum of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79109

matthew_wright@fd.org
8063242370
Party name: Howard Leon Combs
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543