Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5763
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5763
Title:Jose Lara-Garcia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-40108)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2019.
Oct 30 2019Response to petition from respondent United Staes of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Borden v. United States, 593 U. S. ___ (2021).
Jul 23 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Shephard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002

kathryn_shephard@fd.org
7137184600
Party name: Jose Lara-Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United Staes of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543