Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5727
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5727
Title:Trayvon Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10225)
   Decision Date:May 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 23 2019Response Requested. (Due October 23, 2019)
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2019Reply of petitioner Trayvon Smith filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peggy Sasso
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender
2300 Tulare Street, Suite 330
Fresno, CA 93721

peggy_sasso@fd.org
559-487-5561
Party name: Trayvon Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543