Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5652
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5652
Title:Anthony Wayne Bettcher, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 21, 2019
Linked with 18A1277
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4165)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2019Application (18A1277) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2019 to August 16, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 06 2019Application (18A1277) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 16, 2019.
Aug 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 20, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendix
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Response to petition from respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 19 2019Reply of petitioner Anthony Wayne Bettcher filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin C. McMurray
    Counsel of Record
Utah Federal Public Defender
46 W Broadway
Suite 110
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Benji_McMurray@fd.org
8015244010
Party name: Anthony Wayne Bettcher
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543