Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-563
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-563
Vide 19-422
Title:Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury, et al, Petitioners
v.
Patrick J. Collins, et al.
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20364)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief of respondents Patrick J. Collins, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Bryndon Fisher, Bruce Reid, & Erick Shipmon in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Patrick J. Collins, et al.
Other
Robert Carter Schubert
    Counsel of Record
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
Three Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

rschubert@sjk.law
415-788-4220
Party name: Bryndon Fisher, Bruce Reid, & Erick Shipmon

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543