Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5617 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5617 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Gary Ray Bowles, Petitioner
v.
Florida, et al.
Docketed:August 16, 2019
Linked with 19A183
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC19-1184, SC19-1264)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 16, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Application (19A183) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 17 2019Brief of respondents Florida, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2019Response to application from respondents Florida, et al. filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2019Reply of petitioner Gary Bowles filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Disability Rights Florida, National Disability Rights Network, and Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Florida Association for Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Application (19A183) referred to the Court.
Aug 22 2019Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Aug 22 2019Application (19A183) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Terri Lynn Backhus
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender-ND Florida
227 N. Bronough Street
Suite 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

terri_backhus@fd.org
8139428818
Party name: Gary Bowles
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Florida, et al.
Other
April Lynn Boyer
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
Southeast Financial Center, Suite 3900
200 South Biscayne Boulevard
Miami, FL 33131-2399

april.boyer@klgates.com
3055393300
Party name: Florida Association for Criminal Defense Lawyers and Florida Association for Criminal Defense Lawyers Miami Chapter
John Charles Ulin
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter
777 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 4400
Los Angeles, CA 90017

john.ulin@arnoldporter.com
2132434000
Party name: Disability Rights Florida, National Disability Rights Network, and Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543