Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-560
Title:Jennie Nicassio, Petitioner
v.
Viacom International, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2085)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 31, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Waiver of right of respondents Viacom International, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 02 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Motion for leave to proceed further herein in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony H. Handal
    Counsel of Record
Handal & Morofsky, LLC
83 East Avenue
Suite 308
Norwalk, CT 06851

handal@handalglobal.com
9178800811
Party name: Jennie Nicassio
Attorneys for Respondents
Wook Hwang
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb LLP
345 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10154

whwang@loeb.com
212-407-4035
Party name: Viacom International, Inc.;, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543