Aug 06 2019 | Application (19A191) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 27, 2019 to October 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Aug 19 2019 | Application (19A191) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 26, 2019. |
| |
Oct 28 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 01 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Nov 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019. |
| |
Nov 21 2019 | Response Requested. (Due December 23, 2019) |
| |
Nov 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Army Trial Defense Service filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Dec 17 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2020. |
| |
Jan 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2020. |
| |
Feb 21 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 10 2020 | Reply of petitioner McDonald filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Mar 11 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020. |
| |
Mar 30 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |