Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-554
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-554
Title:50 Murray Street Acquisition LLC, Petitioner
v.
John Kuzmich, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(50, 51)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Brief of respondents John Kuzmich, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Real Estate Board of New York filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Richard A. Epstein filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 09 2019Reply of petitioner 50 Murray Street Acquisition LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: 50 Murray Street Acquisition LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert S. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP
Seven Times Square
New York, NY 10036-6516

rsmith@fklaw.com
212-833-1100
Party name: John Kuzmich, et al.
Other
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7726
Party name: Professor Richard A. Epstein
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Real Estate Board of New York

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543