Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5526
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5526
Title:Frances W. Lake, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:August 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2421)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 9, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent Wilke, Robert to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 23 2019Response Requested. (Due October 23, 2019)
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Brief of respondent Wilke, Robert in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.
Feb 04 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frances Lake2385 Dolly Ridge Rd., Apt. 352 E
Vestavia, AL 35243

Party name: Frances Lake
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilke, Robert

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543