Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-550
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-550
Title:Kimberly Watso, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jodi Harpstead, Commissioner, Minnesota Department of Human Services, et al.
Docketed:October 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1723)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendixProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Jodi Harpstead, in her official capacity as Commissioner of the Minnesota Department of Human Services to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Judge John E. Jacobson; Tribal Court of the Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Nov 01 2019Waiver of right of respondent Scott County to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Nov 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents Judge Mary Ringhand, in her official and the Tribal Court of the Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians to respond filed.
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 27 2019Response Requested. (Due December 27, 2019)
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Jan 27 2020Brief of respondent Judge John E. Jacobson; Tribal Court of the Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert L. Sirianni Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstone, P.A.
P.O. Box 2047
Winter Park, FL 32789

Robertsirianni@brownstonelaw.com
(407)-388-1900
Party name: Kimberly Watso, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James R. Andreen
    Counsel of Record
Erstad & Riemer, P.A.
200 Riverview Officer Tower
8009 - 34th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55425

jandreen@erstad.com
952-837-3249
Party name: Scott County
Richard Alan Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
2200 Wells Fargo Center
90 South 7th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

richard.duncan@faegredrinker.com
612-766-8612
Party name: Judge John E. Jacobson; Tribal Court of the Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community
Aaron E. Winter
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100
St. Paul, MN 55101

aaron.winter@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1453
Party name: Jodi Harpstead, in her official capacity as Commissioner of the Minnesota Department of Human Services
Joseph PlumerPlumer Law Office
9352 North Grace Lake Road
Bemidji, MN 56601

jplumer@paulbunyan.net
218-556-3824
Party name: Judge Mary Ringhand, in her official and the Tribal Court of the Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543