Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-546
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-546
Title:Douglas Brownback, et al., Petitioners
v.
James King
Docketed:October 28, 2019
Linked with 19A184
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2101)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A184) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 26, 2019 to September 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2019Application (19A184) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 25, 2019.
Sep 13 2019Application (19A184) to extend further the time from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Application (19A184) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Brief of respondent James King in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Reply of petitioners Douglas Brownback, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition GRANTED.
Apr 09 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 19, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Jun 19 2020Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 19 2020Brief of petitioners Douglas Brownback, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 9, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Brief of respondent James King filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Aug 31 2020Amicus brief of Members of Congress not accepted for filing. (Corrected PDF to be submitted - August 31, 2020)
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and National Police Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Amicus brief of Professors James Pfander, Gregory Sisk & Zachary Clopton not accepted for filing. (September 10, 2020 - corrected brief to be submitted).
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors James Pfander, Gregory Sisk & Zachary Clopton filed. (9/11/2020) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is electronically filed.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED
Sep 23 2020Reply of petitioners Douglas Brownback, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Argued. For petitioners: Michael R. Huston, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Patrick M. Jaicomo, Arlington, Va.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Douglas Brownback, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
703.682.9320
Party name: James King
Other
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union et al
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Cato Institute and National Police Accountability Project
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Law Enforcement Action Partnership
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Professors James Pfander, Gregory Sisk & Zachary Clopton
Angela C. Vigil
    Counsel of Record
Baker and McKenzie LLP
815 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

angela.vigil@bakermckenzie.com
202-452-7000
Party name: Members of Congress
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543