Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5421
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5421
Title:Charles Earl Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 31, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10748)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 22 2019Response Requested. (Due September 23, 2019)
Sep 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to October 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioner Charles Earl Davis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Joel Page
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
525 S. Griffin Street
Suite 629
Dallas, TX 75202

joel_page@fd.org
214-767-2746
Party name: Charles Earl Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543