Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5417
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5417
Title:Travis Wayne Bentley, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:July 31, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-743)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 24 2019Response Requested. (Due October 24, 2019)
Oct 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Reply of petitioner Travis W. Bentley filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of McGirt v. Oklahoma, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).
Aug 10 2020MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 10 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Travis Wayne Bentley#585018
Lexington Correctional Center
P.O. Box 260
Lexington, OK 73051-0260

Party name: Travis W. Bentley
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543