Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5325
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5325
Title:Alan Victor Gomez Gomez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 25, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20526)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 26, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 22 2019Response Requested. (Due September 23, 2019)
Sep 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to October 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2019.
Oct 23 2019Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Shephard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002

kathryn_shephard@fd.org
7137184600
Party name: Alan Gomez Gomez
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543