Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-532
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-532
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2019
Linked with 19A295
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16496)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2019Application (19A295) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2019 to October 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 14 2019Application (19A295) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 24, 2019.
Oct 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 22, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Brief amici curiae of California Municipalities and Elected Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Sheriffs' Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2019Brief of respondents State of California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 02 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Mar 03 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.
Apr 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: State of California, et al.
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: National Sheriffs' Association
Kurt Robert Hilbert
    Counsel of Record
The Hilbert Law Firm, LLC
205 Norcross Street
Roswell, GA 30075

khilbert@hilbertlaw.com
7705519310
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: California Municipalities and Elected Officials

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543