Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5256
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5256
Title:Anthony J. Livingstone, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0085/CG)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 19, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 31 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony J. LivingstoneP.O. Box 452136
San Diego, CA 92145

Party name: Anthony Livingstone
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543