Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-521
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-521
Title:ChargePoint, Inc., Petitioner
v.
SemaConnect, Inc.
Docketed:October 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1739)
   Decision Date:March 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019.
Nov 20 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Jeremy C. Doerre.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief of respondent SemaConnect, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 08 2020Reply of petitioner ChargePoint, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Jeremy C. Doerre GRANTED.
Jan 27 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: ChargePoint, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alan Lee Whitehurst
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
1300 I Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

alanwhitehurst@quinnemanuel.com
2025388000
Party name: SemaConnect, Inc.
Marissa Rachel DuccaQuinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

marissaducca@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: SemaConnect, Inc.
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
11325 N. Community House Road, Suite 250
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543