Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-518
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-518
Vide 19-465
Title:Colorado Department of State, Petitioner
v.
Micheal Baca, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1173)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Micheal Baca.
Blanket Consent
Nov 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Thomas E. Weaver.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Colorado Department of State.
Blanket Consent
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent Micheal Baca in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Michael T. Morley in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of South Dakota, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Interested Legal Scholar Robert M. Hardway filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 04 2019Reply of petitioner Colorado Department of State filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Thomas E. Weaver GRANTED.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-465 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-465. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-465. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF LAW, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado Department of State
Attorneys for Respondents
L. Lawrence Lessig
    Counsel of Record
Equal Citizens
12 Eliot St.
Cambridge, MA 02138

lessig@law.harvard.edu
617-496-1124
Party name: Micheal Baca
Other
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws
Jennifer Lynn Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Ireland Stapleton Pryor and Pascoe
717 17th Street
Denver, CO 80202

jgilbert@irelandstapleton.com
720-401-0439
Party name: Interested Legal Scholar
Michael T. Morley
    Counsel of Record
Florida State University College of Law
425 W. Jefferson Street, Roberts Hall, Office 313
Tallahassee, FL 32306

michaelmorleyesq@hotmail.com
8607783883
Party name: Michael T. Morley
Paul S. Swedlund
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Office of the Attorney General
1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1
Pierre, SD 57501-8501

paul.swedlund@state.sd.us
6057735402
Party name: South Dakota
Thomas E. Weaver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 1056
Bremerton, WA 98337

tweaver@tomweaverlaw.com
3607929345
Party name: Thomas E. Weaver

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543