Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Victor Hugo Saldano, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:July 16, 2019
Linked with 18A873
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70025)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2019Application (18A873) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2019 to July 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Application (18A873) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 11, 2019.
Jul 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Aug 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2019 to September 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops and Catholic Mobilizing Network filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Amicus brief of Government of the Republic of Argentina not accepted for filing. (August 20, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Aug 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Government of the Republic of Argentina, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2019 to October 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 16, 2019.
Oct 16 2019Brief of respondent Davis, Director TDCJID in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Reply of petitioner Victor Saldano filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Scott Smith
    Counsel of Record
120 South Crockett Street
P.O. Box 354
Sherman, TX 75091

scottsmithlawyer@gmail.com
9038688686
Party name: Victor Saldano
Attorneys for Respondent
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Davis, Director TDCJID
Other
Mark Edward Chopko
    Counsel of Record
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW - Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

mchopko@stradley.com
2024198410
Party name: Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops and Catholic Mobilizing Network
Jonathan Mathias Miller
    Counsel of Record
Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90010-1106

jmiller@swlaw.edu
310-717-4220
Party name: Government of the Republic of Argentina, et al.
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543