Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-514 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-514 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Nikko A. Jenkins, Petitioner
v.
Nebraska
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-17-577, S-17-657)
   Decision Date:July 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Nov 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2019.
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of National Disability Rights Network et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2019 to January 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 10, 2020.
Jan 10 2020Brief of respondent State of Nebraska in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 28 2020Reply of petitioner Nikko Jenkins filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 06 2020Rescheduled.
Mar 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.
Mar 19 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: Nikko Jenkins
Attorneys for Respondent
James D. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Department of Justice
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

james.smith@nebraska.gov
402-471-2686
Party name: State of Nebraska
Other
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: National Disability Rights Network et al.
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117

bcohen@defendla.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543