Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5133
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5133
Title:Andrew Anthony Brown, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States
Docketed:July 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14151)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 9, 2019)
Jul 01 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Aug 05 2019Waiver of right of respondent Barr, Att'y Gen. to respond filed.
Aug 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 06 2019Response Requested. (Due October 7, 2019)
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2019.
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019.
Dec 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Dec 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 6, 2020.
Dec 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2020.
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2020 to March 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 6, 2020.
Mar 06 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed.
Mar 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of the confession of error by the Solicitor General in his brief for the respondent filed on March 6, 2020.
May 22 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Anthony Brown#2019033908
Duval County Jail
500 E. Adams St.
Jacksonville, FL 32202

Party name: Andrew A. Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543