Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-495
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-495
Title:Martin Shkreli, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-819-cr, 18-1084-cr)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark M. Baker
    Counsel of Record
Brafman & Associates, P.C.
767 Third Avenue
26th Floor
New York, NY 10017

mbaker@braflaw.com
212-750-7800
Party name: Martin Shkreli
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543