Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-493
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-493
Title:James J. Maksimuk, Petitioner
v.
Connor Sport Court International, LLC
Docketed:October 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1156)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 15, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.
Feb 06 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James J. Maksimuk38325 6th Street East
Palmdale, CA 93550

(323) 420-6794
Party name: James Maksimuk

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543