Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-487
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-487
Title:Kevin W. Culp, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kwame Raoul, Attorney General of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:October 15, 2019
Linked with 19A123
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2998)
   Decision Date:April 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2019Application (19A123) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 11, 2019 to October 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019Application (19A123) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 10, 2019.
Oct 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to January 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2020.
Nov 14 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Missouri,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief of respondents Kwame Raoul, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Reply of petitioners Kevin W. Culp, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David G. Sigale
    Counsel of Record
Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.
430 West Roosevelt Road
Wheaton, IL 60187

dsigale@sigalelaw.com
6304524547
Party name: Kevin W. Culp, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Ann HungerOffice of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

shunger@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5202
Party name: Kwame Raoul, et al.
Other
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Missouri Attorney General's Office
207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543