Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-484
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-484
Title:John Doe 1, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Election Commission
Docketed:October 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5099)
   Decision Date:April 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Motion (19M54) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019MOTION (19M54) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Motion (19M54) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2019.
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Brief of respondent Federal Election Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 04 2020Reply of petitioners John Doe 1, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: John Doe 1, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Election Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543