Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-477
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-477
Title:Arletta J. Kurowski, Petitioner
v.
Estate of Kenneth H. Kurowski, et al.
Docketed:October 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1391, 19-1982)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendix
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 16 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Arletta J. KurowskiN6088 County Rd. E.
De Pere, WI 54115

(920) 391-9848
Party name: Arletta Kurowski

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543