Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-466
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-466
Title:Zachery Pittman, Petitioner
v.
Herman Harris
Docketed:October 9, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7308)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent Herman Harris to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 03 2019Response Requested. (Due January 2, 2020)
Dec 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2020 to February 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondent Herman Harris in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Reply of petitioner Zachery Pittman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Alito would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald Brandon Christian
    Counsel of Record
NCLEAG, PLLC
3344 Presson Road
Monroe, NC 28112

brandon.christian@ncleag.com
9107502265
Party name: Zachery Pittman
Attorneys for Respondent
Kevin Franz King
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

kking@cov.com
202 662 5488
Party name: Herman Harris
Rafael ReyneriConvington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

rreyneri@cov.com
202-662-5787
Party name: Herman Harris

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543