Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-46
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-46
Title:United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al., Petitioners
v.
Booking.com B.V.
Docketed:July 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2458, 17-2459)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Brief of respondent Booking.com B.V. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Reply of petitioners United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Patent and Trademark Office; Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan E. Moskin
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016-1314

jmoskin@foley.com
212-682-7474
Party name: Booking.com B.V.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543