Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-455
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-455
Title:ARRIS International Limited, Petitioner
v.
ChanBond, LLC, et al.
Docketed:October 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2426, 2018-2427, 2018-2428, 2018-2429, 2018-2430)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2019Motion (19M28) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Jul 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2019MOTION (19M28) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Motion (19M28) for leave to file a petiiton for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
Oct 31 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019Waiver of right of respondent ChanBond, LLC to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Nov 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2019, for all respondents.
Dec 06 2019Brief of respondent Andrei Iancu in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 20 2019Reply of petitioner Arris International Limited filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald J. English
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
505 9th Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

djenglish@duanemorris.com
202-776-5228
Party name: Arris International Limited
Donald J. English
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
505 9th Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

djenglish@duanemorris.com
202-776-5228
Party name: Arris International Limited
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu
Andrea Pacelli
    Counsel of Record
King & Wood Mallesons LLP
500 5th Avenue, 50th Floor
New York, NY 10110

andrea.pacelli@us.kwm.com
212-319-4755
Party name: ChanBond, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543