Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-453
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-453
Vide 19-416
Title:Cargill, Inc., Petitioner
v.
John Doe I, et al.
Docketed:October 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55435)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John Doe I, et al.VIDED
Blanket Consent
Oct 25 2019Waiver of right of respondents John Doe I, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Coca-Cola Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chevron Corporation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Confectioners Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 04 2019Response Requested. (Due December 4, 2019)
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Brief of respondents John Doe I, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for distribution of the petition under to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioner Cargill, Incorporated filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-416 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-416. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-416. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 1, 2020. VIDED.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Oct 08 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Dec 01 2020Argued. For petitioners: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.; and Curtis E. Gannon, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Paul L. Hoffman, Hermosa Beach, Cal. VIDED.
Jun 17 2021Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I and II, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Sotomayor, Kagan, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Part III, in which Gorsuch and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Alito, J., joined as to Part I, and in which Kavanaugh, J., joined as to Part II. Sotomayor, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion. VIDED.
Jul 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 02 2021Motion to Tax Cost Award and Waive Costs for Indigent Respondents of John Doe I, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 26, 2021 - duplicate submission. See 19-416.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Cargill, Incorporated
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP
200 Pier Ave.
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: John Doe I, et al.
Other
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the National Foreign Trade Council, the National Association of Manufacturers, and the Organization for International Investment
William S. Dodge
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Davis, School of Law
400 Mrak Hall Drive
Davis, CA 95616

wsdodge@ucdavis.edu
510-421-0494
Party name: International Law Scholars
Samuel Estreicher
    Counsel of Record
NYU School of Law
40 Washington Sq. South
New York, NY 10012

samuel.estreicher@nyu.edu
212-998-6226
Party name: Professors of International Law, Foreign Relations Law and Federal Jurisdiction
Jack L. Goldsmith
    Counsel of Record
1563 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

goldsmith.jack@gmail.com
(617) 384-8159
Party name: Chevron Corporation
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: The National Confectioners Association, the World Cocoa Foundation, and the European Cocoa Association
Charity Starr Ryerson
    Counsel of Record
Corporate Accountability Lab
6214 N. Glenwood Ave.
Chicago, IL 60660

charity@corpaccountabilitylab.org
3178507384
Party name: Tony's Chocolonely
Charity Starr Ryerson
    Counsel of Record
Corporate Accountability Lab
6214 N. Glenwood Ave.
Chicago, IL 60660

charity@corpaccountabilitylab.org
3178507384
Party name: Small and Mid-Size Cocoa and Chocolate Companies
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Coca-Cola Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543