Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-446
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-446
Title:VF Jeanswear LP, Petitioner
v.
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Docketed:October 3, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16786)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2019.
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 3, 2020.
Jan 03 2020Brief of respondent U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 20 2020Reply of petitioner VF Jeanswear, LP filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.
Apr 06 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Marion Powell
    Counsel of Record
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
300 N. Greene Street
Suite 1900
Greensboro, NC 27401

Jimmy.Powell@wbd-us.com
336-574-8081
Party name: VF Jeanswear, LP
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543