Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-439
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-439
Title:CTIA - The Wireless Association, Petitioner
v.
City of Berkeley, California, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15141)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, CTIA – The Wireless Association®
Blanket Consent
Oct 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Berkeley, California, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice and National Federation of Independent Business filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of National Advertisers, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc.,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief of respondents City of Berkeley, California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: CTIA – The Wireless Association®
Attorneys for Respondents
Lawrence Lessig
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1563 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138

lessig@law.harvard.edu
6174968853
Party name: City of Berkeley, California, et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
202.588.0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbrown@wileyrein.com
2027197579
Party name: The Cato Institute
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Association of National Advertisers, Inc.
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Justin Marc Pearson
    Counsel of Record
lnstitute for Justice
2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3180
Miami, FL 33131

JPearson@IJ.org
(305) 721-1600
Party name: Institute for Justice and National Federation of Independent Business
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Business Roundtable, National Association of Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543