Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-432
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-432
Title:All American Check Cashing, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-90015)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, All American Check Cashing, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 2, 2019.
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The States Of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Brief of respondent Consumer Financial Protection Bureau in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 12 2019Reply of petitioners All American Check Cashing, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: All American Check Cashing, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: The States Of Texas, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, And West Virginia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543