Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-423
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-423
Title:Brian Kirk Malpasso, et al., Petitioners
v.
William M. Pallozzi, Superintendent, Maryland Department of State Police
Docketed:September 30, 2019
Linked with 19A59
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2377)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2019Application (19A59) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2019 to September 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Application (19A59) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 26, 2019.
Sep 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent William M. Pallozzi to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 08 2019Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for William M. Pallozzi submitted.
Blanket Consent
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 18 2019Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2019)
Oct 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2019 to December 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 18, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Brian Kirk Malpasso, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Julia Doyle Bernhardt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7291
Party name: William M. Pallozzi
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
(970) 485-3303
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Madison Society Foundation, and Second Amendment Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543