Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-422
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-422
Vide 19-563
Title:Patrick J. Collins, et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:September 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20364)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Brief of respondents Mnuchin, Steven T., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Blackwells Capital LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Reply of petitioners Patrick J. Collins, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Patrick J. Collins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mnuchin, Steven T., et al.
Other
Jason Alan Levine
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jlevine@velaw.com
2026396755
Party name: Blackwells Capital LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543