Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-414
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-414
Title:Medtronic, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mark A. Barry
Docketed:September 27, 2019
Linked with 19A44
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2463)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 09 2019Application (19A44) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2019 to September 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 16 2019Application (19A44) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 26, 2019.
Sep 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2019 to November 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by R Street Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Medtronic, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: Mark A. Barry
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543