Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-411 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-411 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Rodney Reed, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 26, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-50,961-08, WR-50,961-09)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project at the Project On Government Oversight filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Deke Pierce and Other Current and Former Texas Law Enforcement Officers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 04 2019Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryce Benjet
    Counsel of Record
The Innocence Project
40 Worth Street
Suite 701
New York, NY 10013

bbenjet@innocenceproject.org
2123645980
Party name: Rodney Reed
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Dennis Ottoway
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548
Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711

matthew.ottoway@oag.texas.gov
5124637463
Party name: Texas
Other
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

linda.goldstein@dechert.com
212-698-3500
Party name: Deke Pierce and Other Current and Former Texas Law Enforcement Officers
Justin Seth Weddle
    Counsel of Record
Weddle Law PLLC
250 West 55th Street, Floor 30
New York, NY 10019

jweddle@weddlelaw.com
2129975518
Party name: The Constitution Project at the Project On Government Oversight

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543